Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Registration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0076
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 /CH0078
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0257
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811 (SB0782)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0304
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Class L (Historic) Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Outstanding Arrest Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB0811)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0201 /CH0076 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0203 /CH0078 Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 /CH0257 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0811 (SB0782) Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum Age Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1203 Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1229 /CH0304 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of Registration Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.
Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 AM
SB0124 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Class L (Historic) Vehicles Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0451 Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles Senator Guzzone 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0522 Vehicle Laws - Registration - Outstanding Arrest Warrants Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB0811) Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum Age Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM