Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0953)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0485)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Courts - Aggravated Murder Court
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 (SB0515/CH0178)
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0407)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 /CH0178 (HB1295)
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB0388)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 (SB0953) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0485) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Courts - Aggravated Murder Court Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 (SB0515/CH0178) Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court Delegate Carter 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0136 Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0407) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 /CH0178 (HB1295) Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 Task Force on Assistance for Families of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 (HB0388) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM