Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 /CH0666
Title
Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 /CH0626 (SB0073/CH0627)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 /CH0356 (SB0792/CH0357)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0627 (HB0735/CH0626)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0454
Title
Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Visitation and Notification
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0357 (HB0754/CH0356)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1100
Title
Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0081 /CH0666 Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 /CH0626 (SB0073/CH0627) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0754 /CH0356 (SB0792/CH0357) Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1165 Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax Repeal Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0073 /CH0627 (HB0735/CH0626) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0454 Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Visitation and Notification Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0357 (HB0754/CH0356) Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1100 Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM