Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788
Title
Estates and Trusts - De Minimis Check or Instrument Payable to Closed Estate - Presumption of Abandonment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 (SB0381/CH0291)
Title
Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Methods of Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0498 (SB0382/CH0499)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Division or Consolidation of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0322
Title
Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities - Exception for Tenant's Option to Purchase
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0323
Title
Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0262
Title
Estates and Trusts – Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 /CH0291 (HB0898)
Title
Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Methods of Notice
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0499 (HB0932/CH0498)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Division or Consolidation of Trust
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Policy of the State
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0436 Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0788 Estates and Trusts - De Minimis Check or Instrument Payable to Closed Estate - Presumption of Abandonment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 (SB0381/CH0291) Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Methods of Notice Delegate Johnson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0914 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 /CH0498 (SB0382/CH0499) Maryland Trust Act - Division or Consolidation of Trust Delegate Johnson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1061 Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1140 /CH0322 Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State Delegate Chisholm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Delegate Ivey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1360 Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities - Exception for Tenant's Option to Purchase Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0077 Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0212 /CH0323 Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0262 Estates and Trusts – Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 /CH0291 (HB0898) Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Methods of Notice Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0499 (HB0932/CH0498) Maryland Trust Act - Division or Consolidation of Trust Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Policy of the State Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM