Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Names

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0084/CH0016)
Title
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name Change
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 /CH0609
Title
Maryland Perfusion Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 (SB0877)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0340 (SB0785/CH0339)
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 /CH0455
Title
St. Mary's County - John Hanson Briscoe Circuit Courthouse for St. Mary's County
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0458
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0016 (HB0488)
Title
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0030
Title
Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 /CH0339 (HB1215/CH0340)
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838
Title
Private Process Servers - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Restrictions on Altering Building Names
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1119)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0488 (SB0084/CH0016) Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name Change Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 /CH0609 Maryland Perfusion Act - Revisions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 (SB0877) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1215 /CH0340 (SB0785/CH0339) Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1393 /CH0455 St. Mary's County - John Hanson Briscoe Circuit Courthouse for St. Mary's County St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 /CH0458 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0005 Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0084 /CH0016 (HB0488) Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name Change Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0030 Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 /CH0339 (HB1215/CH0340) Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 Private Process Servers - Licensing Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Restrictions on Altering Building Names Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0877 (HB1119) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM