Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 /CH0452
Title
Program Open Space Sites - Public Access
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State Police
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0292 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 /CH0452 Program Open Space Sites - Public Access Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands President 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0535 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State Police Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM