Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423
Title
Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Notice to Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270)
Title
Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 (SB0046)
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0501/CH0698)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 (SB1065)
Title
Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0958)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440
Title
Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485 /CH0531
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0795)
Title
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119
Title
Program Open Space – Local Funds – Acquisition and Development of Land for Education Purposes
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Baltimore County - Program Open Space - Local Funds - Acquisition and Development of Land for Educational Purposes
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0698 (HB0801)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0270 (HB0696/CH0271)
Title
Carroll County – Scenic River Advisory Board – Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0700
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - Ocean City Life-Saving Station Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB0947)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1260 /CH0719
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0423 Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Notice to Municipal Corporations Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270) Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0795 (SB0046) Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0501/CH0698) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0870 (SB1065) Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0947 (SB0958) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance Fee Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 /CH0531 Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners Delegate Fisher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 (HB0795) Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law) Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 Program Open Space – Local Funds – Acquisition and Development of Land for Education Purposes Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 Baltimore County - Program Open Space - Local Funds - Acquisition and Development of Land for Educational Purposes Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 /CH0698 (HB0801) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0601 /CH0270 (HB0696/CH0271) Carroll County – Scenic River Advisory Board – Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0606 /CH0700 Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0849 Beach Erosion Control District - Ocean City Life-Saving Station Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0926 Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 (HB0947) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1260 /CH0719 Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM