Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 /CH0518
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441
Title
Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Misconduct
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0691)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0574)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154 (SB0951)
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0963)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0517
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0869)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0644)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 (HB1154)
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB1169)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0157 /CH0518 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0265 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0279 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0629 Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Misconduct Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0644 (SB0691) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0574) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0885 Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1154 (SB0951) Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
HB1169 (SB0963) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 /CH0517 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0869) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0644) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 (HB1154) Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0963 (HB1169) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM