Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 (SB0055)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 (SB1114)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0802)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 (HB0440)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 (HB0604)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1114 (HB0585)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0329 Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB0440 (SB0055) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0585 (SB1114) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0604 (SB0802) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0055 (HB0440) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0225 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0240 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0802 (HB0604) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1114 (HB0585) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM