Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 (SB0248)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0429)
Title
Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0219)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 /CH0228
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 /CH0212
Title
State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422
Title
Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 (HB0503)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0368)
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0452)
Title
Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0368 (SB0248) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 (SB0429) Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0219) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 /CH0228 Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 /CH0212 State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1422 Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 (HB0503) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0248 (HB0368) Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law) Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0367 Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0429 (HB0452) Procurement Contracts - Architectural and Engineering Services - Indemnity Clauses Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM