Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0029)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0368)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0352)
Title
Criminal Law – Workgroup on Criminal and Gross Negligence
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330
Title
Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0681)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755
Title
Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0136 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0352 (SB0029) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law) Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 (SB0368) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Delegate Hartman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0029 (HB0352) Criminal Law – Workgroup on Criminal and Gross Negligence Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0157 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0368 (HB0681) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0755 Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:05 PM