Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0907)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1136 (SB0523)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271
Title
Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or Likeness
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0012
Title
Environment - Public Hearings - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB1136)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0953)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0811 Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0953 (SB0907) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1136 (SB0523) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1271 Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or Likeness Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0012 Environment - Public Hearings - Notice Requirement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB1136) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0953) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM