Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0142)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0580)
Title
Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 (SB0581)
Title
Local Governments - Legal Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0837)
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0709)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164)
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0566)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0663)
Title
Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0666)
Title
Local Governments - Legal Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1460)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0229
Title
Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0915)
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1164 (HB1636/CH0314)
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0566 (SB0142) Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising Delegate Sophocleus 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0663 (SB0580) Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 (SB0581) Local Governments - Legal Notice Requirements Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0837) Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1460 (SB0709) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1595 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164) Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0142 (HB0566) Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0663) Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB0666) Local Governments - Legal Notice Requirements Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB1460) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0761 Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0229 Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB0915) Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1164 (HB1636/CH0314) Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM