Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB1003)
Title
Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0706
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Renewals and Adult Entertainment
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Adult Entertainment Establishments
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003 (HB0097)
Title
Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB1003) Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0959 /CH0706 Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Renewals and Adult Entertainment Delegate Mosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1389 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Adult Entertainment Establishments Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1003 (HB0097) Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM