Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 (SB0322)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0801)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322 (HB0914)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB1169)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0914 (SB0322) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 (SB0801) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0322 (HB0914) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB1169) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM