Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 /CH0584 (HB0870/CH0585)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0149 Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0876 /CH0584 (HB0870/CH0585) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM