Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nurses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 (SB0980)
Title
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 /CH0608
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 /CH0627
Title
Hospitals - Protocol for Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations and Planning Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0807)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0031
Title
Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1339)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980 (HB0441)
Title
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 (SB0980) Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Health and Government Operations
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0661 /CH0608 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0963 /CH0627 Hospitals - Protocol for Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations and Planning Committee Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0807) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0031 Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1339) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 (HB0441) Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM