Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nurses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015
Title
Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0474
Title
Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0251
Title
Higher Education - Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Scholarship Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0200 (SB0393/CH0199)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 /CH0277 (SB0071)
Title
Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492 (SB0928)
Title
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561 (SB1081/CH0241)
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0771/CH0277)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0159
Title
Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 /CH0199 (HB0490/CH0200)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 /CH0385 (HB1494/CH0386)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1235)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1492)
Title
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561)
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting Requirement Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 /CH0474 Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0107 /CH0251 Higher Education - Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Scholarship Amount Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 /CH0200 (SB0393/CH0199) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0771 /CH0277 (SB0071) Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0911 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 (SB0895) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 (SB0928) Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1561 (SB1081/CH0241) Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Health and Government Operations
4/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 (HB0771/CH0277) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0159 Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0393 /CH0199 (HB0490/CH0200) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 /CH0385 (HB1494/CH0386) Income Tax - Credit for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1235) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills Checklist Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1492) Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561) Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM