Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0670
Title
Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0326)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0326 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1159 /CH0670 Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0333 (HB0326) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM