Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0317
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714
Title
Nursing Homes - Health Care Quality Account - Adoption and Use of Electronic Health Records
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542 (SB1092)
Title
Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092 (HB1542)
Title
Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - Modification
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0317 Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 Nursing Homes - Health Care Quality Account - Adoption and Use of Electronic Health Records Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1542 (SB1092) Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - Modification Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1092 (HB1542) Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - Modification Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM