Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 /CH0367
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 /CH0317 (SB0752/CH0316)
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 (SB0898)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0022
Title
Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 /CH0316 (HB1119/CH0317)
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1137)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0333 /CH0367 Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0834 Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 /CH0317 (SB0752/CH0316) Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program Delegate Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Appropriations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 (SB0898) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1449 Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0086 /CH0022 Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 /CH0316 (HB1119/CH0317) Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1137) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM