Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0205
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 /CH0637 (SB0531/CH0638)
Title
Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 /CH0641
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0416
Title
Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 /CH0638 (HB0269/CH0637)
Title
Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 /CH0642
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 /CH0205 Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0269 /CH0637 (SB0531/CH0638) Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 /CH0641 Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 /CH0416 Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 /CH0638 (HB0269/CH0637) Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0625 /CH0642 Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM