Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271 (SB0276)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0271)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0271 (SB0276) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0013 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0276 (HB0271) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM