Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Maryland Elder Abuse Victims Resources Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1270 Maryland Elder Abuse Victims Resources Committee Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM