Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0524)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Let's Play Maryland Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 (SB0677/CH0377)
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0575)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0377 (HB1069)
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691
Title
Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0214
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Relocation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0575 (SB0524) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995 Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1031 Governor's Office for Children - Let's Play Maryland Pilot Program Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB1069 (SB0677/CH0377) Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0575) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0377 (HB1069) Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding Requirement Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0940 /CH0214 Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Relocation Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM