Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Children (O4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 /CH0108 (SB0207/CH0109)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396
Title
Child Care Centers – Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 /CH0247 (SB0455/CH0248)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0662)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 (SB0828)
Title
State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 (SB1018)
Title
Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468
Title
Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1550
Title
Child Care Providers – Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1559
Title
Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations (Child Care for Working Families Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0109 (HB0206/CH0108)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0248 (HB0547/CH0247)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0986)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 (HB1135)
Title
State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB1386)
Title
Child Care Centers - Employee Qualifications - Requirements and Application Review
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 /CH0108 (SB0207/CH0109) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Delegate Krimm 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 108
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0396 Child Care Centers – Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0547 /CH0247 (SB0455/CH0248) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0986 (SB0662) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1135 (SB0828) State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1386 (SB1018) Child Care Centers – Teacher Qualifications Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1468 Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act) Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1550 Child Care Providers – Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden’s Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1559 Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations (Child Care for Working Families Act) Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 /CH0109 (HB0206/CH0108) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0455 /CH0248 (HB0547/CH0247) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 248
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0637 Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0662 (HB0986) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0828 (HB1135) State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0918 Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB1386) Child Care Centers - Employee Qualifications - Requirements and Application Review Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:34 PM