Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206)
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Public Service Commission - Commissioners - Selection and Term
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0136
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206) Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0937 Public Service Commission - Commissioners - Selection and Term Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0136 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions Senator Conway 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM