Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0343)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 (HB1020)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 (HB1169)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1169 (SB0343) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0178 (HB1020) State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath Senator Guzzone 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 (HB1169) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM