Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0092)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Accountability and Compliance - Establishment PG 508-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 (HB0045)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 /CH0468
Title
Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0092) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0194 Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Accountability and Compliance - Establishment PG 508-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0766 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0092 (HB0045) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 /CH0468 Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM