Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0392)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0655)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0655 (SB0392) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0655) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM