Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0215 (SB0646/CH0216)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429
Title
Maryland Pilots Act - Refusal of Tugboat Services - Pilot Assignment and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Enforcement of Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0233)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0216 (HB0604/CH0215)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 /CH0215 (SB0646/CH0216) Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349) Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1239 Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1429 Maryland Pilots Act - Refusal of Tugboat Services - Pilot Assignment and Reporting Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0066 Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Enforcement of Regulations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0160 (HB0233) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158) Clean Energy Jobs Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0646 /CH0216 (HB0604/CH0215) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM