Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ocean City

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049 /CH0602
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1049 /CH0602 Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page