Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Off-Road Vehicles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Dirt Bikes
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Prince George's County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Penalty for Highway Use PG 312-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 /CH0281
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045
Title
Hunting - Use of Motorized Vehicles - Wounded or Disabled Military
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Dirt Bikes Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Prince George's County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Penalty for Highway Use PG 312-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 /CH0281 Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 Hunting - Use of Motorized Vehicles - Wounded or Disabled Military Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM