Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Ombudsmen
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0760)
Title
Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0681 State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Ombudsmen Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1194 (SB0760) Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices President 6 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM