Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Opioids -see also- Controlled Dangerous Substances; Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 (SB0893)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337
Title
Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751 /CH0549
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0498)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 /CH0537
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0820)
Title
Public Health - Co-Prescribing, Prescribing and Dispensing Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0139)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312
Title
Life Insurance - Prohibition on Discrimination - Opioid Overdose Reversal Drug
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0847)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response - Storage Warehouses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570
Title
Distribution of Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 /CH0357 (HB0599/CH0358)
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1392)
Title
Public Health – Co–Prescribing, Prescribing and Dispensing Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 (HB0033)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 (SB0893) Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0035 Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB0139 (SB0135) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 /CH0549 Health Insurance - Prior Authorization - Requirements Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 (SB0498) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 /CH0537 Opioid Restitution Fund Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0820) Public Health - Co-Prescribing, Prescribing and Dispensing Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0135 (HB0139) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0312 Life Insurance - Prohibition on Discrimination - Opioid Overdose Reversal Drug Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0847) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 Public Health - Overdose Response - Storage Warehouses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 Distribution of Fentanyl Resulting in Death Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0631 /CH0357 (HB0599/CH0358) Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1392) Public Health – Co–Prescribing, Prescribing and Dispensing Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0893 (HB0033) Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM