Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 (SB0954)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705)
Title
Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1284/CH0402)
Title
Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Policy of the State
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB0567)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0567 (SB0954) Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705) Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
SB0705 (HB1284/CH0402) Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0790 Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Policy of the State Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0954 (HB0567) Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM