Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0151)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485
Title
Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and Pension
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0193)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0193 (SB0151) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0199 Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0824 Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and Pension Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1336 Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0151 (HB0193) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM