Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0436 Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0624 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM