Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Overtime

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0641)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138 (SB0827)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1138)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0641) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1138 (SB0827) State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 (HB1097) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1138) State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 1:27 PM