Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0145)
Title
Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0362)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 (SB0830)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0001)
Title
Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 (HB0348)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
Oyster Management Plan - Harvest - Study
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 (HB0720)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1051
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Public Fishery Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 (SB0145) Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0040 Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Delegate Busch 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0348 (SB0362) Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 (SB0830) Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters Delegate Barve 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1153 Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0145 (HB0001) Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 (HB0348) Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate Material Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0683 Oyster Management Plan - Harvest - Study Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 (HB0720) Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters Senator Elfreth 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB1051 Natural Resources - Oysters - Public Fishery Pilot Program Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM