Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 /CH0574 (SB0900/CH0573)
Title
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0628
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0987)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 (SB1014)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149
Title
Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500
Title
Vehicle Laws - Handicapped Parking Placards - Required Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0320/CH0033)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 /CH0573 (HB0335/CH0574)
Title
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB0781/CH0388)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 (HB1065)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0335 /CH0574 (SB0900/CH0573) Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0642 /CH0628 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0987) Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1065 (SB1014) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1149 Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1500 Vehicle Laws - Handicapped Parking Placards - Required Statement Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0320/CH0033) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County Senator Klausmeier 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 /CH0573 (HB0335/CH0574) Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 (HB0781/CH0388) Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1014 (HB1065) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM