Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0169)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0076
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288
Title
Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0096)
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Parking
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 (HB0880)
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Parking
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 (HB0133)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0133 (SB0169) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 /CH0076 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - Jurisdiction Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Delegate McMillan 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0880 (SB0096) Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Parking Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0096 (HB0880) Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Parking Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0124 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 (HB0133) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer Senator Gladden 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM