Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 (SB0366)
Title
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0731
Title
Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 (SB0487)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Garrett-Jacobs Mansion Access and Safety Project
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566 (SB0488)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's Hope
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0913)
Title
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB1096)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Garrett-Jacobs Mansion Access and Safety Project
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB1566)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's Hope
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1304)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0183 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 (SB0366) Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1024 /CH0731 Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 (SB0487) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Garrett-Jacobs Mansion Access and Safety Project Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
HB1107 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB1036) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1566 (SB0488) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's Hope Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
SB0168 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0913) Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development Projects Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB1096) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Garrett-Jacobs Mansion Access and Safety Project Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0488 (HB1566) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's Hope Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB1036 (HB1304) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM