Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Parking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0803
Title
Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0345
Title
Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel Parking
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903 /CH0780 (SB0847)
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 /CH0137
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Social Organization
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1637
Title
Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0041
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780)
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0803 Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI Delegate McConkey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative Penalties Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0345 Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0889 Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel Parking Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0903 /CH0780 (SB0847) Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Delegate Glenn 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1498 /CH0137 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Social Organization Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1637 Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - Requirement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0041 Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Senator Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780) Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Washington County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM