Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Partnerships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School Students
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0992)
Title
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0714)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1044)
Title
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1086
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1194
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School Students Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0308 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1044 (SB0992) Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1566 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0508 Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0656 (HB0714) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0992 (HB1044) Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1086 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1194 Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM