Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Partnerships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0993)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 (SB0473)
Title
Prince George's County - School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 PG 512-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0395)
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723
Title
Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0830
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0225
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0865)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1619
Title
Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1804 /CH0590
Title
Health – Medical Research Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB0448)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 (HB0195)
Title
Prince George’s County – School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1095)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0018)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 /CH0594
Title
Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1236
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Transportation Facility Projects - Environmental Impact Statement
Sponsor
Chair, PST&E Subcommittee of the Budget & Taxation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0993) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 (SB0473) Prince George's County - School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 PG 512-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0448 (SB0395) Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter Requirements Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0723 Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – Administration Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0816 /CH0830 Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0225 Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0865) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1619 Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1641 Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1804 /CH0590 Health – Medical Research Funding Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 (HB0448) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0473 (HB0195) Prince George’s County – School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB1095) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0890 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0993 (HB0018) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 /CH0594 Recordation Tax - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1236 Public-Private Partnerships - Transportation Facility Projects - Environmental Impact Statement Chair, PST&E Subcommittee of the Budget & Taxation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014) 21st Century School Facilities Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM