Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Paternity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0076
Title
Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1075 Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 /CH0076 Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM