Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0779)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 (SB0337)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles - Use of Crosswalks
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578 (SB0338)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 /CH0754 (SB0925)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Roadways - Crossing by Pedestrians of Roadways - Authority of Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Riverdale Park Station Pedestrian Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0527)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Pedestrians - Use of Crosswalks
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0578)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Signals
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB0997/CH0754)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0237 (SB0779) Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0527 (SB0337) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles - Use of Crosswalks Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 (SB0338) Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0997 /CH0754 (SB0925) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 Roadways - Crossing by Pedestrians of Roadways - Authority of Local Jurisdictions Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Riverdale Park Station Pedestrian Improvements Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
SB0337 (HB0527) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Pedestrians - Use of Crosswalks Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 (HB0578) Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Signals Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 (HB0997/CH0754) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM