Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 /CH0295
Title
Department of Transportation – Pedestrian and Bicycle Access to Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0407/CH0722)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0868)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0502
Title
Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465
Title
Civil Actions - Motor Vehicle Accidents Involving Pedestrians or Nonmotorized Vehicles - Comparative Negligence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1099)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0285 /CH0295 Department of Transportation – Pedestrian and Bicycle Access to Schools Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0407/CH0722) Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0868) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1209 /CH0502 Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law) Delegate Proctor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1380 State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation Activity Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0407 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721) Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0465 Civil Actions - Motor Vehicle Accidents Involving Pedestrians or Nonmotorized Vehicles - Comparative Negligence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0868 (HB1099) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM