Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Perjury

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784
Title
Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Health - Mifepristone - Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Health - Abortion - 24-Hour Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0682 Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0784 Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 Health - Mifepristone - Administration Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1151 Health - Abortion - 24-Hour Waiting Period Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page